LALIT KUMAR BHUTORIA
-
About LALIT KUMAR BHUTORIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U23101WB2002PLC095191 SHREE BALAJI COAL TRADERS LIMITED 21476820.0 Active 13/04/2007 - U40103WB2010PLC145957 SMJ POWERS INDIA LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/04/2010 - U63013WB2002PLC095192 TIRUPATI CARRIER LIMITED 15820000.0 Active 30/09/2017 - U67120WB1994PTC064863 PCB ENTERPRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 1713270.0 Active 13/04/2007 - U70101WB1996PLC081138 SRI VENKATESH COMPLEX LIMITED 3360200.0 Amalgamated 13/04/2007 - U70101WB1996PTC081121 SHIV NIKETAN PRIVATE LIMITED 16799000.0 Active 13/04/2007 - U80901WB2014PTC200828 AKHO EDUSERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 10/03/2014 -