LAKSHMI RANI TARACHAND GARG
-
About LAKSHMI RANI TARACHAND GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24100MH2012PLC235534 KARTIKEN FERTILIZERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 10/07/2014 - U51909MH2002PTC138471 ISHWAR GOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/08/2016 - U63090MH2002PTC138425 NEXIA ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 30000000.0 Active 12/07/2014 - U63090TN2009PLC072875 KARTIKEN LOGISTICS LIMITED 1300000.0 Active 20/02/2014 - U72900MH2008PTC180704 THREEG ID TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/03/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
SHASHI PRABHA CHAUHAN Director RAKESH GARG Director MAMTA BATRA Director SRINIVASAN NATESAN Director