LATHA SRINIVAS KANAKAGIRI
-
About LATHA SRINIVAS KANAKAGIRI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15400PN2013PTC148689 SAFFRON NUTRACEUTICALS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/03/2016 - U15410MH2007PTC172640 SMART FUNCTIONAL FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 01/04/2013 - U67120MH2007PTC166711 SAFFRON CAPITAL ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 20050000.0 Active 10/12/2014 - U67190MH2010PTC207633 SAFFRON FINANCIAL ADVISORY & CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 02/09/2013 - U74140AP2008PTC090968 GOLDHILL CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 498000.0 Active 04/11/2008 - U74999MH2017PTC301654 SAFFRON EQUITY ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 5300000.0 Active 10/11/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
SRINIVAS KANAKAGIRI Director