LOKESH KALRA
-
About LOKESH KALRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40101DL1999PTC099002 RIGOSS ELECTRIC DISTRIBUTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/07/2016 - U45201DL1998PTC095675 ANSAL REAL ESTATE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/07/2016 - U45201DL1999PTC098223 RIGOSS ESTATE NETWORKS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/11/2017 - U45201DL2003PTC120262 ANSAL BUILDWELL INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 2600000.0 Active 27/05/2013 - U45201RJ2007PTC023944 ANSAL JKD PEARL DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 29/07/2016 - U45300DL1988PLC031165 ANSAL ENGINEERING PROJECTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/07/2016 - U45300DL1998PTC094569 POTENT HOUSING AND CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/11/2017 - U55101DL1997PTC087151 SANKALP HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/07/2016 - U70101DL1998PTC096126 A P M BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/07/2016 - U70109DL1997PTC091337 CHANDRAPRABHA ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/07/2016 - U70109DL2006PTC151963 ANSAL BUILDWELL INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/07/2016 - U74899DL1994PTC060157 S S TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/06/2014 - U74899DL1994PTC060163 K C TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/06/2014 - U74899DL2005PTC142103 ANSAL BUILDWELL REAL ESTATE PROMOTERS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 18/07/2016 -