LALIT KUMAR MEHTA
-
About LALIT KUMAR MEHTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40104RJ2014PTC046273 RAYS POWER INFRA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/07/2015 - U40105CH2014PTC035250 EARTH SOLAR POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 4642860.0 Active 10/09/2015 - U40106RJ2010PTC032173 RAYS SOLAR ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/07/2015 - U40106RJ2011PTC035492 SHINING SUN POWER (KARNATAKA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/08/2015 - U40300DL2010PTC207399 INTERNATIONAL SOLAR CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 7945000.0 Active 04/01/2016 - U51909WB2009PTC139705 TOUCH POINT SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 1400000.0 Active 30/07/2015 - U51909WB2009PTC140166 AXIS DEALTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 1352000.0 Active 30/07/2015 - U51909WB2010PTC146811 JHANKAR DEALTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/07/2015 - U51909WB2010PTC146813 MORTAL COMMODEAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/07/2015 - U74999RJ2010PTC033729 RAYS POWER CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 30/07/2015 - -
Associated with Directors