MIHIR CHANDRAKANT KOTECHA
-
About MIHIR CHANDRAKANT KOTECHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100MH2004PTC145576 NHAVA SHEVA CFS AND AGRI PARK PRIVATE LIMITED 563640.0 Active 16/09/2014 - U55204MH2013PTC244176 ACHIJA DELICACY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/06/2013 - U63090MH2002PTC135892 GREENWICH MERIDIAN LOGISTICS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 77500000.0 Active 15/05/2002 - U63090MH2007PTC173783 INTEGRATED LOGISTICS SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 05/09/2007 - U63090MH2012PTC238465 ISHANA FREIGHT AND LOGISTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 03/12/2012 - U74120MH2014PTC254185 FIDELITY GLOBAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 12/03/2014 - U74900MH2010PTC204346 INTEGRITY LOGISTIC SOLUTION (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 16/06/2010 - U74999MH2010PTC202113 MORPHOSIS REALTORS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 15000000.0 Active 17/04/2010 - U74999MH2013PTC246126 TASK MASTERS ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/07/2013 - -
Associated with Directors