MAMTA DALAL SUNIL
-
About MAMTA DALAL SUNIL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L32109MH1973PLC016345 DIGITAL ELECTRONICS LIMITED 2376000.0 Active 30/09/1997 - U26100MH1972PTC016118 TAKTAWALA BROTHERS PRIVATE LIMITED 998000.0 Active 01/07/1991 - U26100MH1979PTC021869 TAKTAWALA GLASS INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 01/01/1994 - U72300MH2000PTC123780 SOFTDEL SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 76370490.0 Active 15/12/2015 - U74900MH2007PTC174924 ASSET VANTAGE SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 30976540.0 Active 11/10/2007 - U74999MH1992PTC066422 UNIDEL VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 586700.0 Active 30/09/2017 - U74999MH2005PTC154267 RASIKLAL MANEKLAL CAPITAL ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 12000000.0 Active 30/07/2008 - U74999MH2016PTC282936 VASANT VILAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/06/2016 - -
Associated with Directors