MAMTA ADITYA MANGALDAS
-
About MAMTA ADITYA MANGALDAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17110MH1913PLC000357 THE VICTORIA MILLS LIMITED 9856000.0 Active 08/08/2011 - U45202MH2009PTC197073 VICTORIA LAND PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/11/2009 - U51900MH1994PTC078484 BROMELIA TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 21/03/2002 - U74999MH1992PTC066422 UNIDEL VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 586700.0 Active 04/08/2017 - -
Associated with Directors