MICHAEL PHILIP PINTO
-
About MICHAEL PHILIP PINTO,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L21011WB1936PLC008726 STAR PAPER MILLS LTD. 156083000.0 Active 29/01/2010 - L45200MH1993PLC071970 ASHOKA BUILDCON LIMITED 935744055.0 Active 31/05/2007 - U61100MH1974PLC017161 TOLANI SHIPPING COMPANY LIMITED 546520000.0 Active 14/11/2008 - U61100MH2006PLC163149 SHAPOORJI PALLONJI FORBES SHIPPING LIMITED 820000000.0 Active 18/11/2008 - U67110MH2000PTC129483 PRINCIPAL TRUSTEE COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 11/11/2011 - U74999GJ2016NPL093397 SAILORS WELFARE ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 17/08/2016 - -
Associated with Directors