MAHAVIRPRASAD SUMERCHAND JAIN
-
About MAHAVIRPRASAD SUMERCHAND JAIN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17110GJ1991PTC016513 JAI MAHAVIR PRINTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5500000.0 Active 16/01/2015 - U17119GJ1991PTC016207 VITRAG DYEING AND PRINTING MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 15414800.0 Active 28/11/2011 - U17119GJ1994PTC023043 PANCHHI PRINTS PRIVATE LIMITED 5051700.0 Active 19/01/2009 - U17119GJ2003PTC041986 JAI JINENDRA PRINTS PRIVATE LIMITED 4000000.0 Active 01/04/2010 - U17120GJ2010PTC060416 SHRI VIDHYA SUDHA PRINTS PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 25/04/2010 - U51109GJ2005PTC082575 SANSKAR VINIYOG PRIVATE LIMITED 1600000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 11/05/2009 - U70101GJ2011PTC067573 ARHAM REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 3750000.0 Active 20/10/2011 - U74300MH1996PTC255604 SURAT RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 06/11/1996 - -
Associated with Directors