MALLIKA SRINIVASAN
-
About MALLIKA SRINIVASAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L01132TZ1922PLC000234 THE UNITED NILGIRI TEA ESTATES COMPANY LIMITED 49965660.0 Active 25/01/2011 - L15491WB1962PLC031425 TATA GLOBAL BEVERAGES LIMITED 631129729.0 Active 22/10/2008 - L27100MH1907PLC000260 TATA STEEL LIMITED 9712158890.0 Active 21/05/2012 - U15499TN1992PLC023544 TAFE ACCESS LIMITED 41159790.0 Active 04/05/1994 - U29129TN1960PLC004337 TRACTORS AND FARM EQUIPMENT LIMITED. 120000000.0 Active 27/12/1994 - U29211TN2005PLC055476 TAFE MOTORS AND TRACTORS LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 24/02/2005 - U45201TN1983PTC010043 TRUST PROPERTIES DEVELOPMENT CO PRIVATE LIMITED 420000.0 Active 27/06/1983 - U50300TN2003PLC051918 TAFE REACH LIMITED 45000000.0 Active 07/11/2003 - U65991TN1921NPL001337 CHENNAI WILLINGDON CORPORATE FOUNDATION 19250.0 Active 02/06/2015 - U70109TN2017PLC119698 TAFE PROPERTIES LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 27/11/2017 - U80100TG1997NPL036631 INDIAN SCHOOL OF BUSINESS 0.0 Active 29/09/2002 - -
Associated with Directors