MRUGESH JAYKRISHNA JAYKRISHNA
-
About MRUGESH JAYKRISHNA JAYKRISHNA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24100GJ2007PTC051654 FLYOVER COMMUNICATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/09/2007 - U62200GJ1979PTC003365 SKYJET AVIATION PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/10/1980 - U65910GJ1983PTC005897 ANSUMALINI INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/06/2000 - U65990GJ1950PTC000511 H K (INVESTMENT) COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 08/06/2000 - -
Associated with Directors