MEENA YADVINDER SEHRA
-
About MEENA YADVINDER SEHRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17116MH1995PLC086449 HOUSE OF ANITA DONGRE LIMITED 44100000.0 Active 02/05/2003 - U18100MH2005PTC151989 SUVIDA DESIGNS PRIVATE LIMITED 38743800.0 Active 01/05/2010 - U18109MH2011PTC220919 EASTHILL DESIGNS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 12/08/2011 - U51900MH1979PTC021088 ANIRA EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 303000.0 Active 21/02/1999 -