MAHENDRA KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About MAHENDRA KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201RJ1995PTC011282 AADARSH BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/02/2015 - U45201RJ1995PTC011284 SWASTIK BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/07/1996 - U45201RJ1996PTC011958 JAIMALA CONSTRUCTIONS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 20/11/2014 - U45201RJ1996PTC012115 PANSARI CONSTRUCTIONS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 31/05/1996 - U45201RJ1999PTC015490 DREAM FLATS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/02/2015 - U70101RJ2005PTC020472 INDER-RATAN CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/06/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
JAIMALA AGARWAL Director ANIL KUMAR FATEHPURIA Director