MOHAN AGRAWAL
-
About MOHAN AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01409MP1997PLC011544 EAGLE SEEDS AND BIOTECH LIMITED 33258940.0 Active 27/12/2006 - U21010MH1987PTC042306 TRIUMPH PAPER AND ALLIED PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 01/08/2001 - U45200MH2005PTC158007 HELLENIC PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 3100000.0 Active 13/12/2005 - U45202MH2008PTC178387 STONE VALLEY PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/01/2008 - U45202MH2008PTC185782 PILBARA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/08/2008 - U45202MH2008PTC185783 PALENCIA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/08/2008 - U65990MH1990PTC059549 CORINTHIAN INVESTMENTS P LTD 500000.0 Active 01/11/1995 - U65990MH1992PTC067530 NIMIT SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/07/2011 - U65990MH1992PTC069815 SHAMOLI INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 219500.0 Active 26/03/2002 - U70102MH2008PTC178386 OLMEC PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/01/2008 - U70102MH2008PTC183412 PARTHENON PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 11/06/2008 - U72900MH1993PTC074111 PULSAR CONSULTANTS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 01/04/1998 - U74140MH1973PTC016529 DESAI AND ASSOCIATES PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 09/10/1998 - U74140MH2005PTC155609 BAPA CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 08/12/2010 - U74999MH1980PTC023612 DR THAKARES AGRO INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINNEERING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 20/10/2014 - -
Associated with Directors