MANGESH TUKARAM SHIVRAM SAWANT
-
About MANGESH TUKARAM SHIVRAM SAWANT,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1995PTC086087 MANALI DEVELOPMENT AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 6510000.0 Active 01/01/2006 - U55101MH1998PTC117679 PRATHAMESH HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 01/04/2000 - U70100MH1994PTC082400 KARM YOGI PROPERTY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 04/01/2000 - U72200MH2001PLC130449 SAILEE INFOTECH LIMITED 500000.0 Active 15/01/2001 - U89694MH1995PTC089694 SAI LEE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 530140.0 Active 19/06/1995 - -
Associated with Directors