MANISH AGARWAL
-
About MANISH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200DL2006PTC155448 SATYA TOWNSHIPS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/11/2010 - U45201DL2005PTC131889 CLARION ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/01/2005 - U45203DL2005PLC138756 SATYA INFRASTRUCTURES LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 21/11/2005 - U55101DL2004PTC130575 CAPL HOTELS AND SPA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 17/11/2004 - U70101DL1995PTC072172 SATYA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 67208840.0 Active 12/07/1999 - U70101DL2013PTC252265 SATYA INFRABUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/05/2013 - U74899DL1951GAP001947 PHD CHAMBER OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY 0.0 Active 23/12/2011 - U74899DL1995PTC072171 GOODLUCK FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 122000.0 Active 15/02/2003 - U85310DL2013NPL257543 SATYA COMMUNITY CARE FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 10/09/2013 - -
Associated with Directors