MANNIL VENUGOPALAN
-
About MANNIL VENUGOPALAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L63000MH1988PLC048500 SHREYAS SHIPPING AND LOGISTICS LIMITED 219575330.0 Active 03/09/2010 - L65910MH1984PLC032639 DEWAN HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION LIMITED 3136588470.0 Active 25/02/2013 - U65900MH2008PLC178883 LICHFL ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY LIMITED 91944000.0 Active 11/08/2010 - U65910WB1993FLC060810 L&T FINANCE LIMITED 14855018390.0 Active 17/10/2014 - U65990MH1994PLC083147 L & T FINANCE LIMITED 2384222690.0 Amalgamated 27/09/2013 - U67190MH2016PTC273074 DHFL ADVISORY & INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 750100000.0 Active 16/03/2017 - U70109TN2011PLC083385 SHRI KAILASH LOGISTICS (CHENNAI) LIMITED 802000.0 Active 09/02/2017 - U74999HR2013PTC051432 SHAOLIN TRUSTEESHIP PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2015 - U90001DL2007PLC166554 IL&FS ENVIRONMENTAL INFRASTRUCTURE AND SERVICES LIMITED 585872490.0 Active 12/07/2011 - -
Associated with Directors