MOHAN SINGH NAYAL
-
About MOHAN SINGH NAYAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29221DL1984PLC018628 REGENCY INDUSTRIES LIMITED 0.0 Active 20/09/2013 06/09/2016 U65921DL1996PLC076044 RAGHVI FINANCE LIMITED 4643950.0 Active 15/01/2007 - U74899AS1991PTC009229 VEDIKA FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 32275000.0 Active 01/04/2016 - U74899DL1994PTC061461 KARN SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 635000.0 Active 03/12/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
MUKESH KUMAR AGGARWAL Director VINOD PAL SINGH Director SANJAY GARG Director K K AGARWAL Director