MUKESH PALIWAL
-
About MUKESH PALIWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70100UP2013PTC060222 ABHA-AASHIYANA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/10/2013 - U70100UP2013PTC060223 KAVYANSH AASHIYANA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/10/2013 - U70102UP2010PTC039522 VINAYAK SHREE LAND HOLDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2435000.0 Active 10/02/2010 - U70102UP2011PTC046107 T.M. REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 125500.0 Active 09/08/2011 - U70102UP2011PTC046130 A.M. INFRAPROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/08/2011 - U70102UP2013PTC058651 SMA AASHIYANA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Converted to LLP 26/07/2013 - U70200UP2007PTC033332 BIHARI JI REALTOR PRIVATE LIMITED 1380000.0 Active 18/05/2007 - U70200UP2009PTC037743 VINAYAK SHREE INFRA-PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2295000.0 Converted to LLP 08/07/2009 -