MINOO ERUCH DAVAR
-
About MINOO ERUCH DAVAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22120MH1990PTC058782 SPENTA PUBLISHERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/11/1990 - U22122MH2001PTC133056 SPENTA MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/08/2001 - U22122UR2006PTC031867 LIQUID PUBLISHING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/08/2008 - U22200MH1971NPL015200 BOMBAY MASTER PRINTERS ASSOCIATION 0.0 Active 27/09/2012 - U35123MH2006PTC160935 MUMBAI BOAT SHOW PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/11/2009 - -
Associated with Directors