MRIGANKA KISHORE SARKAR
-
About MRIGANKA KISHORE SARKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15500WB1994PTC062808 ALLEN AQUA AND FOOD INSTITUTE PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 21/05/2010 - U24239WB1976PLC030746 JUPITER PHARMACEUTICALS LTD 10082000.0 Active 22/03/2007 - U24239WB1996PTC079942 QUALITY ALLEN PHARMA PRIVATE LIMITED 1322000.0 Active 08/06/2007 - U25209WB1997PLC084227 ALLEN INDUSTRIES LIMITED 9670000.0 Active 01/01/2003 - U33112WB1995PTC071953 FINOP DRUGS PVT.LTD. 2500000.0 Active 29/07/2016 - U51397WB1988PLC043599 ALLEN BIOPHARMA LIMITED 10562500.0 Active 01/01/2005 - U65993WB1992PLC056844 ALLEN'S HOUSING & FINANCE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 01/01/2005 -