MOHENDER KUMAR GARG
-
About MOHENDER KUMAR GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L28100MH1964PLC013064 SOLID CONTAINERS LIMITED 167000000.0 Active 29/04/2008 - U28999MH2010PTC208358 VYOMA ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 5600000.0 Active 28/09/2010 - U36101DL2004PTC127411 EVERGREEN INTERIORS PRIVATE LIMITED 4102500.0 Active 01/03/2010 - U45208MH2001PLC131726 MPIL STEEL STRUCTURES LIMITED 102439000.0 Active 01/01/2016 - U51311DL2002PTC117077 VYOMA OVERSEAS PRIVATE LIMITED 1580000.0 Active 20/09/2002 - U52190MH2009PTC195349 VYOMA EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 31/08/2009 - U70101MH1982PLC028617 AQUALAND (INDIA) LIMITED 2196200.0 Active 01/04/2001 - U74999MH2003PTC141883 WONDER SIGNS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 25/10/2016 - U74999MH2008PTC179307 FAIRPLAY PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/06/2008 - -
Associated with Directors