MAHAL CHAND SARDA
-
About MAHAL CHAND SARDA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U21014WB1990PTC048647 SKYLAND TRADING COMPANY PVT LTD 2600000.0 Active 23/03/1990 - U51109WB1996PTC078759 SARDA SILVERTON SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 5825000.0 Active 30/04/1996 - U51109WB2007PTC113113 JOY BHARAT COMMODEAL PRIVATE LIMITED 520000.0 Active 01/06/2010 - U51909WB1996PTC079074 SILVER STAR COMMOTRADE PVT LTD 11505000.0 Active 20/06/1996 - U51909WB1998PTC088442 SHRISTI COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 4100200.0 Active 03/12/1999 - U51909WB2010PTC149764 ACON COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 29/05/2010 - U65993WB1989PTC047977 SALASAR INDUSTRIAL INVESTMENT PVT LTD 2600000.0 Active 07/12/1989 - U67120WB1990PTC050183 SARDA FINVEST P LTD. 2760000.0 Active 05/02/1992 -