MANOJ KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About MANOJ KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U23203WB1994PTC065419 ARYA GAS COMPANY PVT.LTD. 12210500.0 Active 06/10/1994 - U51909WB1993PTC061287 WELCON AUTO DISTRIBUTORS PVT. LTD. 1480470.0 Active 02/09/2002 - U70101WB1962PTC025564 SHIVA POLYNERS PRIVATE LIMITED. 50174200.0 Active 18/03/1995 - U91110WB1959NPL024140 INDIAN PLASTICS FEDERATION 0.0 Active 21/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors