MUKESH KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About MUKESH KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15205UP1988PTC009831 DASS COLD STORAGE PRIVATE LIMITED 12756000.0 Active 02/01/2012 - U24241UP1990PTC011915 RASHI BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 225000.0 Active 07/08/2003 - U27106UP1992PTC014047 SHIVANGI STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 37503000.0 Active 01/03/2005 - U45200DL2007PTC160614 KSM BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 1131000.0 Active 16/03/2007 - U45200DL2007PTC160727 KSM BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 1560200.0 Active 19/03/2007 - U45201DL2005PTC133688 RADIANT INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 1405000.0 Active 15/02/2017 - U45201DL2006PTC146509 ATTRACTION BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 2215000.0 Active 14/02/2017 - U45201UP1981PTC005404 RAJSHREE BUILDERS AND PROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 11057500.0 Active 03/12/2003 - U45400UP2007PTC033797 KANHA SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2240200.0 Active 27/08/2007 - U45400UP2007PTC033802 MADHUBAN SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 935000.0 Active 27/08/2007 - U70101DL2006PTC148765 MAITRI PROPBUILD PRIVATE LIMITED. 560000.0 Active 13/02/2017 - U70102DL2007PTC160720 KSM DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 875000.0 Active 19/03/2007 - U70102DL2007PTC160728 A ONE LAND SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 1923000.0 Active 19/03/2007 - U70102DL2007PTC160731 KSM INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 835000.0 Active 19/03/2007 - -
Associated with Directors
AMITA AGARWAL Director SANJAY KUMAR AGARWAL Director SHEELA AGARWAL Director