MANISH THAKKAR VALLABHDAS
-
About MANISH THAKKAR VALLABHDAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U26920MH1961PLC012152 EASTERN CERAMICS LIMITED 8000000.0 Active 12/03/1992 - U45200MH1992PTC069147 YASHRAJ DEVELOPERS PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 20/10/1992 - U45200MH1994PTC079704 RATNAKAR BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/07/1994 - U45200MH1994PTC082658 URICO BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3850000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 05/11/1994 - U45200MH1994PTC083476 PARK VIEW BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 18/10/1995 - U45200MH1994PTC083874 HOMELAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 4325000.0 Active 20/12/1994 - U45200MH2003PTC143281 SANGEETA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 102000.0 Active 25/11/2003 - U45202MH1997PTC111862 SKILLFUL BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/09/1999 - U65999PN1995PTC086885 SURAKSHA HOUSING AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 01/01/1999 - U70100MH1994PTC082627 POPHOS PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2180000.0 Active 05/11/1994 - U70102MH2010PTC206717 SM PROJECTS INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/08/2010 - U70200MH1998PTC116818 SWADHINTA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 10/04/2000 - U99999MH1996PTC102184 DIALOGUE LEASE FINVEST PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/01/2015 - -
Associated with Directors