MANISH DILIP SHAH
-
About MANISH DILIP SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01100MH1995PTC088039 AMAL DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 18600000.0 Active 04/07/1995 - U45200MH1995PTC089934 AMAL REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 9900000.0 Active 26/06/1995 - U45200MH2008PTC185521 AXIS HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 06/08/2008 - U45203MH1997PTC112464 AMAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 18500000.0 Active 15/12/1997 - U45400MH1997PTC107138 ADD-MORE REAL ESTATE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2179000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 05/05/1997 - U70100MH1996PTC102651 AXIS REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 26/06/2008 - -
Associated with Directors
ANISH DILIP SHAH Director JAYESH JAYSINH RUKHANA Director KETAN JAYSINH RUKHANA Director