MUKESH BUCHASIA
-
About MUKESH BUCHASIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10101WB2003PTC095626 SAROJ COMMODITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10794600.0 Active 08/01/2003 - U45202WB2016PTC217245 SKRNM BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2016 - U51909WB2006PTC108664 MAHANANDA COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 19000000.0 Active 01/10/2012 - U51909WB2016PTC216913 TIRUMALA BALAJI ENERGY VYAPAAR (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/08/2016 - U74999WB2016PTC217047 VRANN SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/08/2016 -