MEGHNA AGARWAL
-
About MEGHNA AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB2005PTC104473 EMALDA CONGLOMERATE PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 02/07/2016 - U51109WB2007PTC116222 RGA COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 630000.0 Active 30/05/2007 - U51397WB2004PTC098641 SHREEJI COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 1070000.0 Active 28/08/2006 - U51420WB2004PTC097615 JAYSHREE MINERAL MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 1877500.0 Active 02/07/2016 - U52100WB2010PTC146443 OLIVE COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 580000.0 Active 06/05/2010 - U52190WB2010PTC146462 DHANLABH BARTER PRIVATE LIMITED 350000.0 Active 06/05/2010 - U52190WB2010PTC146517 REALITY DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 580000.0 Active 06/05/2010 - -
Associated with Directors
BHARAT BHUSHAN AGARWALA Director JAGADISH SATAPATHI Director SUJATA AGARWAL Director RASHI AGARWAL Director