MUNJAL MRUGESH JAYKRISHNA
-
About MUNJAL MRUGESH JAYKRISHNA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24110GJ1989PLC012441 AKSHARCHEM (INDIA ) LIMITED 82025900.0 Active 28/06/1995 - L24222GJ1990PLC014789 ASAHI SONGWON COLORS LIMITED (LUCKY LAMINATES) 122722620.0 Active 08/03/1996 - U24100GJ2007PTC051654 FLYOVER COMMUNICATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/09/2007 - U24117GJ2010PTC062613 AKSHAR SILICA PRIVATE LIMITED 168600000.0 Active 14/10/2010 - U24233GJ2007PTC051471 ASAHI POWERTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/08/2007 - U40300GJ2007PTC051472 ASAHI ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/08/2007 - U62200GJ1979PTC003365 SKYJET AVIATION PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 09/05/1988 - U74999GJ2016PTC092760 VAPI ENVIRO MANAGEMENT SYSTEM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/07/2016 - -
Associated with Directors