MAHENDRA KUMAR OJHA
-
About MAHENDRA KUMAR OJHA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2010PTC149856 PALANHAR COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 120000.0 Active 05/08/2013 - U51909WB2011PTC164895 NIRVANA DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 850000.0 Active 14/07/2011 - U51909WB2011PTC164968 NAPPER DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 15/07/2011 - U70101WB1983PTC036629 DHARAMRAJ PROPERTIES & MERCHANDISE PVT LTD 3086500.0 Active 20/03/1989 - -
Associated with Directors
GIRDHAR GOPAL ROONGTA Director BISHNU KUMAR MASKARA Director ASHOK KUMAR JAIN Director