MOHAN KRISHNA KEJRIWAL
-
About MOHAN KRISHNA KEJRIWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U11100UP2001PTC026303 POWER CUBE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/08/2007 - U15311UP1979PTC004713 NEW CAWNPORE FLOUR MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 8400000.0 Active 01/03/2007 - U27103UP1994PLC016585 HARSIL HYDRO LIMITED 30600000.0 Active 03/01/2003 - U40102UR2011PTC033576 KAKORAGAD HYDRO PRIVATE LIMITED 6500000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - U40300UR2011PTC033419 SIYANGAD HYDRO PRIVATE LIMITED 6000000.0 Active 21/02/2011 - U40300UR2011PTC033577 JALANDHARYGAD HYDRO PRIVATE LIMITED 12500000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - U51101UP2015PTC068484 BLUE SEAS TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2015 -