MOTI THANWERDAS DADLANI
-
About MOTI THANWERDAS DADLANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1987PTC044201 PINE CONSTRUCTION PVT LTD 2877000.0 Active 06/10/1994 - U45200MH1987PTC044216 NILE CONSTRUCTION PVT LTD 2894900.0 Active 01/10/1994 - U45200MH1987PTC044257 ZEST BUILDERS AND ENGINEERS PVT LTD 6740000.0 Active 31/07/1987 - U74140MH1987PTC044215 SUDARSHAN CONSULTANTS PVT LTD 8305020.0 Active 31/07/1995 - -
Associated with Directors
VISHAL MOTI DADLANI Director RESHMA MOTI DADLANI Director ANJANA HARESH VASWANI Director