MAYUR KALRA
-
About MAYUR KALRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L74899DL1995PLC074364 LITTLE KINGDOM WORLD LIMITED 101007000.0 Active 25/10/2010 15/09/2014 U45200DL2012PTC243462 SUPREME REALINFRA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/10/2012 - U45201DL2006PTC147250 TRENDSETTERS PROPMART PRIVATE LIMITED 900000.0 Active 28/03/2006 - U45201UP2005PTC030419 RAINBOW PROPTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/02/2011 17/07/2017 U66010DL2017PTC310751 VMB INSURANCE BROKER PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Active 18/01/2017 - U70102DL1999PTC102140 TREND SETTERS SPACES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/10/1999 - U70102DL2012PTC243368 JRS TRENDSETTERS PROMOTERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 09/10/2012 - U70109DL2016PTC309509 GALORE AARTH SAMPATTI PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/12/2016 - U70200DL1998PTC093012 DUGGAL CONTRACTORS & TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 21/08/2009 - U93000DL2010PTC207204 MVN FINANCIAL ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 659170.0 Active 05/04/2016 12/10/2017 U93000DL2014PTC265619 MVN CORPORATE SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 898360.0 Active 08/06/2016 - -
Associated with Directors