MUKESH KISHINCHAND SAWLANI
-
About MUKESH KISHINCHAND SAWLANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17116MH1995PLC086449 HOUSE OF ANITA DONGRE LIMITED 44100000.0 Active 14/03/1995 - U18100MH2005PTC151989 SUVIDA DESIGNS PRIVATE LIMITED 38743800.0 Active 16/03/2005 - U18109MH2011PTC220919 EASTHILL DESIGNS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 12/08/2011 - U51900MH1979PTC021088 ANIRA EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 303000.0 Active 11/07/1994 -