MAHESH KANTILAL VORA
-
About MAHESH KANTILAL VORA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51101WB2010PTC148474 SUNDARAM COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 450000.0 Active 01/08/2013 - U51101WB2010PTC149814 SYNAGOGUE DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 450000.0 Active 01/08/2013 - U51109WB1995PTC074750 FEDERAL TRADING PVT LTD 11975000.0 Active 23/06/2009 - U65910MH1996PTC102832 CHITRA CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/09/2000 - U67120WB1996PTC081293 BLOOMINGDALE SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 4989000.0 Active 30/09/2002 - -
Associated with Directors
PANKAJ KANTILAL VORA Director