MOHINDER KAUR SAHLOT
-
About MOHINDER KAUR SAHLOT,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L45101DL1979PLC009654 AHLUWALIA CONTRACTS (INDIA) LIMITED 133975120.0 Active 30/03/2015 - U45200DL2008PTC174077 JUBILANT INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/02/2008 - U45200DL2008PTC174096 ROBUST INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/02/2008 - U45201DL2004PTC127815 K Y INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/08/2005 - U45201DL2005PTC142691 HALLOW INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 1307000.0 Active 21/03/2006 - U45400DL2008PTC172577 JUPITER REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/01/2008 - U74899DL1994PTC061252 ANGAD DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 7225000.0 Active 02/09/1994 - U74899DL1994PTC062919 AEROFIELD FLYING ACADAMY PRIVATE LIMITED 534000.0 Active 23/11/1994 - U85300DL2007PTC163171 OLYMPIC RIDING ACADEMY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/05/2007 -