MADAN SARKAR
-
About MADAN SARKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200WB2007PTC112820 LIMELIGHT NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 460000.0 Active 07/01/2009 - U51109WB1994PTC063272 BISMARAK EXIM PVT. LTD. 20015500.0 Active 03/09/2007 - U51909WB2006PTC108430 ARUNODAYA VANIJYA PVT. LTD. 35365000.0 Active 26/02/2011 - U51909WB2008PTC128719 SANSKAR VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 2738000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - U51909WB2013PLC192930 AUGUSTA COMMODEAL LIMITED 500000.0 Active 31/08/2016 - U70101WB2007PTC118637 FOUNTAIN DEVCON PRIVATE LIMITED 530000.0 Active 07/01/2009 - U70101WB2007PTC120170 HERITAGE NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 897500.0 Active 09/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
DINESH SONI Director VINEET AGARWAL Director JAYDEB MALIK Director SEEMA AGARWAL Director