MOHAN MADHUKAR LIMAYE
-
About MOHAN MADHUKAR LIMAYE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U11100MH2008PLC186731 RELIANCE FUTURA LIMITED 500000.0 Amalgamated 12/09/2008 - U26940MH2008PTC217838 RELIANCE CEMENT CORPORATION PRIVATE LIMITED 1300000.0 Active 08/11/2014 - U26943MH2008PTC217839 RELIANCE CEMENT WORKS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Amalgamated 15/06/2013 - U40101HR2007PLC052109 NORTH KARANPURA TRANSMISSION COMPANY LIMITED 6380000.0 Active 20/05/2010 - U40101MH2000PTC217842 RELIANCE BHAVNAGAR POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 16/07/2012 - U40101MH2004PTC146485 RELIANCE INFRASTRUCTURE ENGINEERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000000.0 Amalgamated 16/07/2012 - U40102MH2009PLC190333 RELIANCE ENERGY GENERATION LIMITED 4775000.0 Amalgamated 13/02/2009 - U40103MH2016PTC274871 RELIANCE E-GENERATION AND MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2016 - U52392MH2000PTC125472 UTKRISHT INFOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Active 29/12/2009 - U64203HR2007PLC052110 TALCHER II TRANSMISSION COMPANY LIMITED 7365000.0 Active 27/04/2010 - U91990MH2005GAP151452 HARMONY ART FOUNDATION 26981000.0 Active 23/01/2014 - U93090TN1988PLC037507 TAMIL NADU INDUSTRIES CAPTIVE POWER COMPANY LIMITED 365100000.0 Active 28/09/2012 - -
Associated with Directors