MAMTA AGARWAL DEVI
-
About MAMTA AGARWAL DEVI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109WB2008PTC131285 BRIGHTSTAR COMMOSALE PRIVATE LIMITED 2012500.0 Active 22/02/2014 - U51909WB1995PTC067646 SUNTRECK FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 18638000.0 Active 03/12/2008 - U52100WB2010PTC153647 ONTRUST RETAILERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2011 - U52190WB2010PTC153597 ONTRUST COMMODEAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2011 - U70102WB2013PTC195587 CHEVIOT DEVCON PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 15/07/2013 - U70102WB2013PTC195589 SUNTRECK COMPLEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/07/2013 - U70102WB2013PTC195603 WEVEX DEVCON PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 30/04/2014 - U70102WB2013PTC195606 SUNTRECK NIKETAN PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 16/07/2013 - U70102WB2013PTC195608 CHEVIOT REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/07/2013 - U74994WB2002PTC094435 SRI BALAJI FASHIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 14278500.0 Active 31/03/2011 - U85110WB2009PTC140491 ULTIMATE HEALTH SOLUTION PRIVATE LIMITED 1235000.0 Active 15/03/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
SUSHILA DEVI AGARWAL Director ASHISH AGARWAL Director AMIT KUMAR AGARWAL Director SUMAN AGARWAL Director