MADAN LAL AGARWAL
-
About MADAN LAL AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01132AS1995PLC004486 CAMELLIA CHA BAR LIMITED 500700.0 Active 29/11/2008 - U01132AS1995PLC004502 DAHEJ OFFSHORE INFRASTRUCTURE SEZ LIMITED 505700.0 Active 15/07/2009 - U40109WB1994PLC109981 DUNCAN MACNEILL POWER INDIA LIMITED 1150000.0 Active 07/08/2009 - U51909WB2004PTC099031 VEDIK VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 16640000.0 Amalgamated 05/07/2004 - U67120WB1994PLC065825 ACCORD SECURITIES LTD. 13579500.0 Active 09/02/2008 - U70101WB1973PTC028826 NAVRANG ESTATES PVT LTD 128300.0 Active 18/08/2015 - -
Associated with Directors