MEGHA DEEPAK KAMBLE
-
About MEGHA DEEPAK KAMBLE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1996PTC098940 NINESTAR DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 372000.0 Active 01/04/2010 - U70100MH2003PTC142535 LAKSHDEEP ESTATE AND HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 06/10/2003 - U70102MH2010PTC201786 SUN BEAM HIGH TECH DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 475000.0 Active 07/04/2010 - U92100MH2008PTC184313 SNEHA PRODUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 470000.0 Active 04/07/2008 - U92490MH2011PTC214537 SNEHA PICTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/03/2011 -