MOHAMMED KHAN
-
About MOHAMMED KHAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15549RJ2006PTC022966 SALASAR BEVERAGES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/08/2006 - U45201RJ2003PTC018581 SALASAR COMPLEXES AND BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 350000.0 Active 11/09/2003 - U45201RJ2006PTC022965 SALASAR INFRAPOWER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/08/2006 - U50300RJ2006PTC023412 SALASAR MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 5100000.0 Active 06/12/2006 - U55101RJ2015PTC047051 SALASAR NATURE & RESORT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 13/02/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
TANVEER KHAN Director ALI AKBAR KHAN Director FEROZ KHAN Director