MUKESH KUMAR AGRAWAL
-
About MUKESH KUMAR AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L28113WB1983PLC036196 GLORY TRADE & EXPORTS LTD. 9833800.0 Active 29/04/2015 - L51109WB1983PLC036003 M.B. COMMERCE LIMITED 10735080.0 Active 07/12/2015 - U51101WB2009PTC136000 DHANVRIDDHI COMMODITIES TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 650000.0 Active 20/02/2016 - U65999WB1995PTC074076 FIXODEAL FINANCE PVT LTD 9926500.0 Active 11/08/2009 - U74140WB2011PTC166893 SAVEDA MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/08/2013 - U74900WB2013PTC195849 LEVERAGE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/11/2016 - U74900WB2013PTC198593 SAHAJ CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/11/2013 - -
Associated with Directors