MUKESH KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About MUKESH KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15419WB1988PLC044472 EFL FOODS LTD 35413700.0 Active 13/02/2012 - U01403WB2014PTC202889 KILKUDI BIOTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/03/2017 - U01403WB2014PTC202948 KILKUDI BIOCROPS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/02/2017 - U51109WB2008PTC125702 MANSAROVAR BARTER PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/01/2017 - U51398WB1993PTC057932 MIDKOT TRADES PVT LTD 17292690.0 Active 24/05/2014 - U70101WB1996PTC081003 SNEHA NIKETAN PVT LTD 1650000.0 Active 11/05/2012 - U70101WB1996PTC081366 SNEHA GARDENS PRIVATE LIMITED 2659000.0 Active 11/05/2012 - U72200WB1994PLC065399 EMAMI CAPITAL MARKETS LIMITED 11847000.0 Active 29/06/2009 - -
Associated with Directors