MILAN KUMAR RANKA
-
About MILAN KUMAR RANKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27107MH2010PTC208315 SHREE OSHIYA STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/09/2010 - U27205MH2010PTC202214 SHREE OSHIYA STRIPS IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 18400000.0 Active 20/04/2010 - U45202MH2009PTC197216 TEEVRA CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/03/2010 - U45400MH2013PTC241808 SHREE OSHIYA INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/04/2013 - U52100MH2012PTC225753 SHREE OSHIYA FERRO ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/2012 - U80900DL2014NPL265965 SHREE OSHIYA EDUCATION & SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT 100000.0 Active 06/03/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
VIJENDRA VIJAYRAJ RANKA Director SATISH KUMAR RANKA Director ANAND ANILKUMAR RANKA Director