MURARI LAL AGARWAL
-
About MURARI LAL AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65993WB1982PLC035564 VIKRAM FINANCIAL SERVICES LTD 60400530.0 Active 16/08/2010 - U45400WB2007PTC116063 ALANKAR NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 2630000.0 Active 01/06/2012 - U45400WB2007PTC116780 SPLENDOR REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/06/2013 - U45400WB2007PTC118779 SILVERLINE NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/11/2012 - U51109WB1994PTC062145 MONOLINK TREXIM PVT. LTD. 56530600.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U51109WB2008PTC122961 DIAGRAM COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 28/06/2014 - U51109WB2008PTC123029 IVORY VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 880000.0 Active 28/06/2014 - U51109WB2008PTC123033 DHANSRI VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 520000.0 Active 28/06/2014 - U51900WB2009PTC133234 MAYUR COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 4979200.0 Active 25/07/2016 - U51909WB2016PLC210103 ASMIN COMMOSALES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 25/07/2016 - U51909WB2016PLC210104 ANUSREE COMMOSALES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 25/07/2016 - U70101WB1989PTC047279 UTILITY CONSTRUCTIONS PVT LTD 10362000.0 Active 30/09/2015 -