MANISH VYAS
-
About MANISH VYAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U14200RJ2012PTC038026 ARUNA UDAY MINING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/02/2012 16/03/2015 U45201RJ2011PTC033967 VYAS COLONISERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/01/2011 - U74140RJ2003PTC018558 MARWAR MANAGEMENT CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 08/12/2016 - U80302RJ2011NPL037484 VYAS FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 31/12/2011 - U80302RJ2012NPL037802 RAJASTHAN VIKAS SANSTHAN 34800000.0 Active 02/02/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
HAR KARAN SINGH Director ARUNA TAK Director JAYANTI Director ASHA VYAS Director