MUKESH AGARWAL
-
About MUKESH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2011PTC168357 SOLTY EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/03/2012 - U45400WB2011PTC170959 STARTREE HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/03/2012 - U51109WB2008PTC128398 VIOLET TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 389000.0 Active 05/03/2012 - U51909WB2008PTC128397 SAPTARSHI TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 05/03/2012 - U51909WB2011PTC170951 SUDARSHAN BARTER PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 14/03/2012 - U51909WB2011PTC171527 SUBHDATA EXIM PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/03/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC172852 MARUBHUMI DEALCOMM PRIVATE LIMITED 145000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 24/01/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC172853 KRISHAL SHOPPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 135000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 24/01/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC172854 MOONLOVE TRADELINKS PRIVATE LIMITED 130000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 24/01/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC172855 PATHIKRIT VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 135000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 24/01/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC172856 WALTAZ TIE-UP PRIVATE LIMITED 145000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 24/01/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC172934 AVIT MERCHANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 153000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 25/01/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC172935 HARDSOFT DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 130000.0 Active 25/01/2012 - U52190WB2012PTC173392 MANGALRASHI TRADELINK PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/03/2012 - U52190WB2012PTC173413 MOONVIEW COMMOSALE PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/03/2012 - U52190WB2012PTC173470 PANCHSHREE DEALTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/03/2012 - U72200WB2012PTC171892 NEXTGEN EDUNET LEARN PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/03/2012 - U74999WB2012PTC173473 SUBHVANI ADVISORY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 14/03/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
PANKAJ JHA Director ABHA DE Director ANAND KUMAR SHARMA Director